OR HB2631 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Work Session scheduled.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: May 17 @ 3:15 pm in Remote B
Hearing: May 19 @ 3:15 pm in Remote B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prescribes notification requirements for school district upon receipt of report of act of harassment, intimidation, bullying or cyberbullying. Prescribes notification requirements for school district upon receipt of report of act of harassment, intimidation, bullying or cyberbullying. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to procedures for hostile educational environments; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19SenateWork Session scheduled.
2021-05-17SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled.
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Education.
2021-04-19SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-15HouseThird reading. Carried by Drazan. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Levy; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
2021-04-14HouseCarried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-13HouseCarried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-12HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-10HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-08HouseCarried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-06HouseSecond reading.
2021-04-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-04-01HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-02HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Education.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback