OR HB2627 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 69, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 69, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows expanded practice dental hygienist to perform interim therapeutic restoration. Allows expanded practice dental hygienist to perform interim therapeutic restoration. Requires agreement between dentist and expanded practice dental hygienist to include expanded practice dental hygienist's scope of practice regarding interim therapeutic restorations. Defines "interim therapeutic restoration." Directs Oregon Board of Dentistry to adopt rules to establish educational and instructional requirements for interim therapeutic restoration and to approve applications from education providers for training courses that meet requirements. Requires certain expanded practice dental hygienists to complete approved training course. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to interim therapeutic restorations; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] | Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] |
Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] | Sen. James Manning [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 69, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Manning Jr. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Drazan. Passed. Ayes, 47; Excused, 13--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Clem, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Wilde, Williams, Zika. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |