OR HB2626 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expands eligibility for Women, Infants and Children Program nutrition assistance to mothers of children up to 12 months of age, paid for with state funds. Expands eligibility for Women, Infants and Children Program nutrition assistance to mothers of children up to 24] 12 months of age, paid for with state funds. Requires Oregon Health Authority to provide notice to families receiving Women, Infants and Children Program nutrition assistance if federal funding for program terminates.
Title
Relating to nutrition assistance for low income families.
Sponsors
Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] |
Rep. Karin Power [D] | Rep. Barbara Warner [D] | Rep. Anna Williams [D] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |