OR HB2625 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-13)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Chapter 119, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 14, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of State Police to study how to increase and improve criminal justice resources relating to missing and murdered Native American women in Oregon and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2020. Directs Department of State Police to study how to increase and improve criminal justice resources relating to missing and murdered Native American women in Oregon and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to missing Native American women; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseChapter 119, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 14, 2019.
2019-05-14HouseGovernor signed.
2019-05-07SenatePresident signed.
2019-05-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-05-06SenateThird reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 20; Absent, 8--Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Thomsen, Winters.
2019-05-02SenateSecond reading.
2019-05-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2019-04-30SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-03-15SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2019-03-14SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-03-13HouseThird reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 60.
2019-03-12HouseSecond reading.
2019-03-11HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-03-07HouseWork Session held.
2019-02-21HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback