OR HB2624 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 209, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 209, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts out-of-state banks, extranational institutions and foreign associations from requirement to file notice before dealing in notes secured by mortgages or trust deeds, if authorized to conduct banking business in this state by certificate of Department of Consumer and Business Services.
Title
Relating to foreign financial institutions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 209, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Carried over to 05-24 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 5--Buehler, Hack, Johnson, Noble, Parrish; Excused, 3--Boone, Gorsek, Stark. |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 6, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-02-27 | House | Second reading. |
2017-02-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |