OR HB2622 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Chapter 362, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires hospitals and ambulatory surgical centers to adopt policies that require use of smoke evacuation system during surgical procedures likely to generate surgical smoke. Requires hospitals and ambulatory surgical centers to adopt policies that require use of smoke evacuation system during surgical procedures likely to generate surgical smoke.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to surgical smoke.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-07HouseChapter 362, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2022.
2021-06-23HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-16SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-08HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 53; Nays, 6--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Morgan, Reschke; Excused, 1--Nearman.
2021-06-07SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-07SenateThird reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Heard, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2021-06-03SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2021-05-26SenateWork Session held.
2021-05-24SenateWork Session held.
2021-05-19SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-29SenateReferred to Health Care.
2021-04-28SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-27HouseThird reading. Carried by Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 5--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Reschke, Zika; Excused, 3--Clem, Leif, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Drazan, Evans, Lewis.
2021-04-26HouseSecond reading.
2021-04-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-04-13HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-02HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Health Care.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2622
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2622/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2622/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2622/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2622/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2622/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2622/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32071
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=518051
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32717
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=527934
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=528452

Bill Comments 750

feedback