OR HB2620 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-19 - Referred to Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Corrections to study issues relating to adults in custody who fight wildland fires and to provide results of study to Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2021. Directs Department of Corrections to study issues relating to adults in custody who fight wildland fires and to provide results of study to Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2021. Sunsets January 2, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to adults in custody who fight wildland fires; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback