OR HB2620 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes cities and rural fire protection districts to adopt plans to provide ambulance and emergency care services to city or rural fire protection district. Requires counties to adopt plans to provide ambulance and emergency care services to county and to negotiate intergovernmental agreements with cities and rural fire protection districts within counties for coordination of ambulance services. Requires counties to submit report on intergovernmental agreements to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to emergency services not later than January 1, 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to emergency services; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2620 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2620/Introduced |