OR HB2619 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits sale, purchase or use of pesticide products containing chlorpyrifos. Prohibits sale, offering for sale,] purchase or use of pesticide products containing neonicotinoid] chlorpyrifos.
Title
Relating to pesticides.
Sponsors
Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Rep. Barbara Warner [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2019-05-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-16 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules. |
2019-04-09 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |