OR HB2619 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 56, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 56, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits pawnbroker to notify pledgor by electronic mail or other electronic means that pledge is at risk of forfeiture if pledgor agrees in writing to notification method. Requires pawnbroker to retain for at least two years electronic record of notice pawnbroker sends by electronic mail or other electronic means.
Title
Relating to pawnbroker notices of risk of pledge forfeiture.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | House | Chapter 56, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Boquist, Monroe, Olsen. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Carried over to 05-04 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Carried over to 05-03 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-02-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed.Ayes, 50; Nays, 6--Barreto, Bentz, McLane, Rayfield, Smith DB, Vial; Excused, 2--Boone, Reardon; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Sanchez. |
2017-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 15, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-02-09 | House | Second reading. |
2017-02-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |