OR HB2618 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Environmental Quality to study methods for disposal of sharps waste and provide results of study in report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Directs Department of Environmental Quality to study methods for disposal of sharps waste and provide results of study in report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to sharps waste; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Rep. Diego Hernandez [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] |
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Rep. Andrea Salinas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2618 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2618/Introduced |