OR HB2614 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals driving privilege suspension and eliminates imposition of driving privilege restrictions for failure to pay fine. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to driving privileges; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-03-19HouseThird Reading. Motion to refer to Ways and Means carried. Referred.
2019-03-18HouseSecond reading.
2019-03-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-03-13HouseWork Session held.
2019-02-25HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-21HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback