OR HB2614 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Chapter 207, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Chapter 207, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain special districts to dispense fuel at nonretail dispensing facility notwithstanding purchase of less than 900 gallons annually. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to minimum fuel purchases by nonretail customers; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Chapter 207, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2015. |
2015-06-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Burdick. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Carried over to 05-20 by unanimous consent. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Clem, McLane. |
2015-04-16 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-04-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |