OR HB2614 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Chapter 478, (2011 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Chapter 478, (2011 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to banking; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to banking; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Chapter 478, (2011 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2011. | |
2011-06-23 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-20 | President signed. | |
2011-06-17 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-14 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Bailey; Excused, 1--Hunt. | |
2011-06-10 | Third reading. Carried by Bonamici. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Bates, Telfer, Verger. | |
2011-06-09 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-08 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-06-01 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-23 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. | |
2011-02-22 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-02-21 | Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 6--Bailey, Buckley, Greenlick, Hoyle, Nolan, Tomei; Excused, 1--Cowan. | |
2011-02-16 | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 21, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-02-14 | Second reading. | |
2011-02-11 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-02-09 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-07 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Business and Labor. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |