OR HB2612 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Department of Agriculture to establish state grades and standards of quality and identity for unpasteurized butter. Directs State Department of Agriculture to establish state grades and standards of quality and identity for unpasteurized butter. Authorizes person to sell or offer for sale within this state unpasteurized butter that conforms to grades and standards established by department. Prohibits person from selling or offering for sale unpasteurized butter that does not conform to grades and standards established by department. Provides that violation is punishable by maximum of 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both. Provides that violation is also subject to civil penalty not exceeding $10,000. Provides that prohibition applies to sale or offer for sale of unpasteurized butter on or after effective date of rules adopted by department establishing grades and standards for unpasteurized butter. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the sale of raw butter; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Vikki Breese-Iverson [R] | Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] | Rep. Bill Post [R] |
Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2612 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2612/Introduced |