OR HB2611 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 120, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Permits agricultural building to be used for uses other than uses set forth in definition of "agricultural building" if additional uses are incidental and accessory to defined uses, are personal to farm owner and farm owner's immediate family or household and do not pose greater hazard to persons or property than defined uses. Prevents application of state structural specialty code to agricultural building used primarily for specified activities.] Permits agricultural building to be used for uses other than uses set forth in definition of "agricultural building" if additional uses are incidental and accessory to defined uses, are personal to farm owner and farm owner's immediate family or household and do not pose greater hazard to persons or property than defined uses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the application of state structural specialty codes to agricultural buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 120, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
2021-06-01HouseGovernor signed.
2021-05-26SenatePresident signed.
2021-05-26HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-24SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-05-24SenateThird reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Boquist, Robinson.
2021-05-20SenateSecond reading.
2021-05-20SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-05-18SenateWork Session held.
2021-05-11SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Energy and Environment.
2021-04-19SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-15HouseThird reading. Carried by Breese-Iverson. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 8--Campos, Fahey, Holvey, Marsh, Prusak, Rayfield, Salinas, Williams; Excused, 4--Levy, Morgan, Smith G, Wallan.
2021-04-14HouseSecond reading.
2021-04-10HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-04-06HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-02HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2611
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2611/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2611/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2611/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2611/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31840
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=516178
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32499
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=524489

Bill Comments

feedback