OR HB2609 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 53, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 2, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 53, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 2, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Health Authority to disclose certain patient information to dental directors for specified purposes. Requires prescription monitoring system established by Oregon Health Authority to be accessible to dental director appointed by authority.] Directs Oregon Health Authority to disclose certain patient information to dental directors for specified purposes. Defines "dental director." Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to dental directors; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 53, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 2, 2019. |
2019-05-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Carried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Findley, Keny-Guyer. |
2019-03-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 28, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-26 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |