OR HB2609 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updates laws that govern nonprofit corporations in this state.
Title
Relating to nonprofit corporations.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Judiciary by order of Speaker. |
2017-02-10 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |