OR HB2607 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: Senate Finance and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts from construction taxes residential housing being constructed to replace residential housing destroyed or damaged by fire or other emergency event or situation. Exempts from construction taxes residential housing being constructed to replace residential housing destroyed or damaged by fire or other emergency event or situation. Applies to residential housing destroyed or damaged on or after January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to construction taxes; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-15SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue.
2021-04-12SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-09HouseThird reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 49; Excused, 11--Alonso Leon, Clem, Dexter, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Nearman, Ruiz, Smith G, Wallan, Zika.
2021-04-08HouseCarried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-06HouseCarried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar.
2021-03-31HouseCarried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-30HouseCarried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-29HouseCarried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-24HouseCarried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-22HouseSecond reading.
2021-03-18HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-03-11HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Revenue by prior reference.
2021-03-04HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
2021-03-01HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Wildfire Recovery with subsequent referral to Revenue.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback