OR HB2606 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes identification card issued by province or territory of Canada as acceptable form of identification for purchase of alcoholic beverages. Includes identification card issued by province or territory of Canada as acceptable form of identification for purchase of alcoholic beverages.
Title
Relating to identification required for purchase of alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to General Government. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2606 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2606/Introduced |