OR HB2604 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces tax rates, reduces maximum eligible income and modifies employment requirements for purposes of taxpayer election of reduced tax rate for certain pass-through income. Reduces tax rates, reduces maximum eligible income and modifies employment requirements for purposes of taxpayer election of reduced tax rate for certain pass-through income. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to elective reduced rate of taxation on pass-through income; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Gregory Smith [R] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] |
Rep. John Lively [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2604 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2604/Introduced |