OR HB2603 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 534, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 534, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires owners or operators of undersea cables to obtain financial assurances for installation and removal of cable and create plan for removal of cable. Requires owners or operators of undersea cables to obtain financial assurances for installation and removal of cable and create plan for removal of cable. Directs Department of Land Conservation and Development to review part of Territorial Sea Plan that addresses placement of cables, pipelines and other utilities in territorial sea and provide results to Ocean Policy Advisory Council. Directs Ocean Policy Advisory Council to propose] develop recommendations for amendments to Territorial Sea Plan regarding placement of undersea cables within territorial sea. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to undersea cables; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 534, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 1--Holvey; Excused, 4--Dexter, Hayden, Smith G, Wilde. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 25, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-14 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-08 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-31 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |