OR HB2603 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Chapter 47, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Transportation to study train delays experienced by trains operated by Amtrak and report on findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to transportation on or before September 15, 2020. Directs Department of Transportation to study train delays experienced by trains operated by Amtrak and report on findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to transportation on or before September 15, 2020. Sunsets January 2, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to rail transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06HouseChapter 47, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
2019-05-01HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-24SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-22SenateThird reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 4--Girod, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Winters.
2019-04-18SenateCarried over to 04-22 by unanimous consent.
2019-04-17SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2019-04-17SenateSecond reading.
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Transportation.
2019-04-08SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-04-04HouseThird reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 2--Wallan, Zika; Excused, 2--Keny-Guyer, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Smith Warner, Williamson.
2019-04-03HouseSecond reading.
2019-04-02HouseSubsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
2019-04-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
2019-03-27HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Transportation with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback