OR HB2600 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that record of financing statement sufficiently provides name of debtor who is individual when record provides individual name, or surname and first personal name, of debtor.
Title
Relating to secured transactions in personal property; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |