OR HB2593 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 458, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 458, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits Office of Emergency Management to enter into agreement with nonprofit organization representing sheriffs under which organization is authorized to administer program to produce and sell outdoor recreation search and rescue cards. Permits Office of Emergency Management to enter into agreement with nonprofit organization representing sheriffs under which organization is authorized to administer program to produce and sell outdoor recreation search and rescue cards. Establishes requirements for agreement. Provides that organization may use revenues from program only to reimburse administrative costs and expenses, to reimburse county sheriffs' offices for certain costs relating to search and rescue and to issue grants for search and rescue purposes. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to funding for search and rescue; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 458, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Wilde. |
2021-06-15 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 16, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-15 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-09 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-03 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2021-04-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |