OR HB2593 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Chapter 118, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Conforms Oregon law related to expression of milk in workplace to federal law. Eliminates] Limits to employers with 10 or fewer employees exemption from providing rest periods for expression of milk in workplace if granting rest period imposes undue hardship. Declares emergency, effective on passage.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to expression of milk in the workplace; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseChapter 118, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
2019-05-14HouseGovernor signed.
2019-05-07SenatePresident signed.
2019-05-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-05-06SenateThird reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 20; Absent, 8--Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Thomsen, Winters.
2019-05-02SenateSecond reading.
2019-05-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2019-04-25SenateWork Session held.
2019-04-23SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-19SenateReferred to Workforce.
2019-04-18SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-04-17HouseThird reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Findley, Rayfield.
2019-04-16HouseSecond reading.
2019-04-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-04-08HouseWork Session held.
2019-01-28HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback