OR HB2591 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 266, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 266, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates month of May of each year as Williams Syndrome Awareness Month.
Title
Relating to Williams Syndrome Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 266, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 26; excused, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Boone, Clem, Gorsek, Hack, Keny-Guyer. |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-30 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |