OR HB2590 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Chapter 533, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Task Force on Student Success for Underrepresented Students in Higher Education. Establishes Task Force on Student Success for Underrepresented Students in Higher Education. Directs task force to develop student success policy and funding proposals focusing on increasing likelihood of student success in higher education for students from populations that are underrepresented in higher education enrollment. Sunsets task force on December 31, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to underrepresented students at public post-secondary institutions of education; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-30HouseChapter 533, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
2021-07-19HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-26SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-23SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-23SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
2021-06-23SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-23SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-06-21SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2021-06-21SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-06-21HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 11--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Levy, Lewis, Morgan, Post, Reschke, Stark, Wallan; Excused, 1--Prusak.
2021-06-21HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-18HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-06-16HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-10HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2021-06-10HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-09HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Education.
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-03-29HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-03-25HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2590
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2590/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2590/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2590/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2590/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31574
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32992
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=532264
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=533156

Bill Comments 750

feedback