OR HB2590 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services to issue grant to organization dedicated to addressing community needs relating to October 1, 2015, shooting on campus of Umpqua Community College. Appropriates moneys to Oregon Department of Administrative Services. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to community recovery after the tragedy at Umpqua Community College; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D] | Sen. Dallas Heard [R] |
Rep. John Huffman [R] | Rep. John Lively [D] | Rep. Mike McLane [R] | Rep. Werner Reschke [R] |
Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-02-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-02-16 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |