OR HB2587 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 591, (2019 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 591, (2019 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
For purposes of homestead property tax deferral program for seniors and persons with disabilities, changes prohibition on homestead with outstanding deferred property taxes from being pledged as security for reverse mortgage to prohibition on homestead that is pledged as security for reverse mortgage from being granted deferral under program. Makes exception for certain homesteads to prohibition on reverse mortgages for participation in homestead property deferral program for seniors and persons with disabilities]. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the homestead property tax deferral program; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | House | Chapter 591, (2019 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2019. |
2019-07-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-05-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 9--Barreto, Bonham, Findley, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Stark, Wallan, Witt; Excused, 1--Hernandez. |
2019-05-14 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Revenue by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue. |
2019-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |