OR HB2585 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ends automatic voter registration through Oregon Motor Voter. Ends automatic voter registration through Oregon Motor Voter. Reestablishes process of registration at any office of Department of Transportation where licenses or renewal applications are distributed or received that existed prior to enactment of Oregon Motor Voter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to voter registration.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-02-14HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-13HouseReferred to Rules.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback