OR HB2577 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 197, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 197, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires minimum three-year delay of effective date for annexation of property that is zoned to allow residential use as permitted use in zone and is in residential use when annexation is initiated. Authorizes record owner of such real property located in territory to be annexed to waive delay of effective date. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to annexations; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 197, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 30, 2019. |
2019-05-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Carried over to 05-22 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 4--Helm, Holvey, Nathanson, Rayfield; Absent, 1--Drazan; Excused, 5--Barreto, Keny-Guyer, Noble, Sprenger, Stark. |
2019-04-10 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |