OR HB2576 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires local governments to approve reconstruction of manufactured dwelling parks after wildfire. Requires local governments to approve reconstruction of manufactured dwelling parks after wildfire. Authorizes local governments to rezone areas for manufactured dwelling parks where wildfires have creating housing scarcity. Allows Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services to exempt those manufactured dwelling parks from certain building codes. Sunsets January 2, 2026. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to development following wildfires; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-26HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Wildfire Recovery.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback