OR HB2576 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Chapter 17, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that under certain circumstances person with totaled or substantially altered vehicle may apply to Department of Transportation to keep same registration plates and remaining registration period. Provides that when person's vehicle is totaled or substantially altered person may keep registration plates with vehicle if vehicle issued branded title or person may transfer plates to another vehicle if vehicle's title is canceled or retired.] Allows person to apply with department to transfer plates from vehicle for which department previously received totaled or substantially altered notification. Allows person to transfer special interest registration plates under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to motor vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-19HouseChapter 17, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
2019-04-02HouseGovernor signed.
2019-03-26SenatePresident signed.
2019-03-26HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-03-25SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Heard, Johnson, Winters.
2019-03-21SenateCarried over to 03-25 by unanimous consent.
2019-03-19SenateSecond reading.
2019-03-19SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2019-03-15SenateReferred to Transportation.
2019-03-14SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-03-13HouseThird reading. Carried by McKeown, McLain. Passed. Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Rayfield.
2019-03-12HouseSecond reading.
2019-03-11HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-03-06HouseWork Session held.
2019-02-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Transportation.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback