OR HB2576 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 107, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 18, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts from wildlife trafficking prevention program sale of covered animal species part or product by or to bona fide scientific or educational institution when sale entered into before July 1, 2017. After July 1, 2017, authorizes State Department of Fish and Wildlife to permit sale of part or product of animal species covered by wildlife trafficking prevention program by or to bona fide scientific or educational institution for scientific or educational purposes. Requires institution to keep documentation from transaction and to provide department with copy of documentation. Makes conforming changes. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to exceptions to wildlife trafficking prevention program; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30HouseChapter 107, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 18, 2017.
2017-05-18HouseGovernor signed.
2017-05-15SenatePresident signed.
2017-05-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-05-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 54; Excused, 3--Gorsek, Johnson, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Smith Warner, Williamson, Speaker Kotek.
2017-05-08SenateThird reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2017-05-04SenateCarried over to 05-08 by unanimous consent.
2017-05-03SenateCarried over to 05-04 by unanimous consent.
2017-05-02SenateSecond reading.
2017-05-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2017-04-27SenateWork Session held.
2017-04-24SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-04-05SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2017-04-04SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2017-04-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Power.
2017-03-30HouseSecond reading.
2017-03-29HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2017-03-23HouseWork Session held.
2017-02-28HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
2017-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2576
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2576/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2576/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2576/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2576/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2576/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2576/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/24807
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=396568
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/25648
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=406924
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=407652

Bill Comments 750

feedback