OR HB2574 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 654, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 654, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Land Conservation and Development to receive, consolidate and organize public record information concerning shellfish mariculture in Oregon. Requires Department of Land Conservation and Development to establish electronic information system to] receive, consolidate and organize public record information concerning shellfish mariculture in Oregon. Requires department to establish electronic system to store and share information concerning shellfish mariculture. Appropriates moneys to department for program for biennium beginning July 1, 2019. Requires State Department of Agriculture to administer and enforce program to regulate commercial mariculture of shellfish on tidelands owned by counties or port districts. Appropriates moneys to department for program for biennium beginning July 1, 2019.] Requires State Department of Agriculture to hold preapplication conference with prospective applicant for cultivation of oysters, clams or mussels. Appropriates moneys to department for program for biennium beginning July 1, 2019. Requires State Department of Fish and Wildlife to establish and administer program for community outreach and instruction regarding opportunities for recreational harvesting of shellfish. Appropriates moneys to department for program for biennium beginning July 1, 2019. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to shellfish; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | House | Chapter 654, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019. |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Steiner Hayward. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barreto. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Findley, McLane, Smith G. |
2019-06-19 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-10 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-07 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |