OR HB2573 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Chapter 307, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Chapter 307, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires counties to approve establishment of dwellings in conjunction with farm use on high-value farmland for cranberry farm operator meeting $40,000 annual income standard. Removes cranberry farms from definition of "high-value farmland.] Sunsets January 2, 2022.
Title
Relating to high-value farmland.
Sponsors
Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] | Sen. Dallas Heard [R] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | House | Chapter 307, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Taylor. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Carried over to 06-03 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by McKeown. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Prusak, Stark. |
2019-04-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 22, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-17 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |