OR HB2570 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates moneys to Oregon Department of Administrative Services to increase size and diversity of group of court appointed special advocates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to court appointed special advocates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-04-09HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-04-03HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-27HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-20HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback