OR HB2568 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Chapter 110, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Chapter 110, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services to conduct review of CASA Volunteer Programs and report results of review and make recommendations for legislation to Legislative Assembly. Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services to conduct study] review of CASA Volunteer Programs and report results of study] review and make recommendations for legislation to Legislative Assembly.
Title
Relating to CASA Volunteer Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Chapter 110, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Thatcher, Winters. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson, Stark. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boshart Davis. |
2019-04-08 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |