OR HB2567 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Employment Relations Board to conduct study relating to public employers subject to public employee collective bargaining act and submit report of board's findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2021. Sunsets January 2, 2022.
Title
Relating to public employers subject to public employee collective bargaining act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2567 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2567/Introduced |