OR HB2567 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires employers with 100 or more employees to provide 60 days' notice to employees and certain officials before ceasing operations, relocating or ordering mass layoff involving 50 or more employees. Creates exceptions. Requires employer attempting to invoke exception involving active pursuit of capital or business to provide, under penalty of perjury, written documentation of efforts to court or Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries. Requires commissioner to adopt rules related to requirements. Provides that employer is liable for back pay to employee and other relief.
Title
Relating to a requirement that certain employers provide notice before a reduction in workforce.
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Witt [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] |
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-24 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2017-04-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed.Ayes, 33; Nays, 23--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 4--Alonso Leon, Boone, Gorsek, Smith G. |
2017-04-20 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-19 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |