OR HB2565 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 76, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 76, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes how priority enrollment system is applied to continuing qualified students and new qualified students.
Title
Relating to veterans enrolled in institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Chapter 76, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Boone, Gorsek, Stark. |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 6, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-02-27 | House | Second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |