OR HB2564 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 229, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Willamette Falls Locks Authority as public corporation. Establishes Willamette Falls Locks Authority as public corporation. Prescribes duties of authority. Modifies duties of Willamette Falls Locks Commission. Sunsets commission on June 30, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Willamette Falls Locks Authority; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 229, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021.
2021-06-11HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-07SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-02HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-27SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-05-27SenateThird reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 4--Heard, Johnson, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 3--Findley, Frederick, Thatcher.
2021-05-26SenateSecond reading.
2021-05-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2021-05-17SenateReferred to Transportation.
2021-05-12SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-05-11HouseThird reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 3--Bonham, Morgan, Wallan; Excused, 3--Levy, Lively, Nearman.
2021-05-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2021-05-04HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-09HouseMotion to rerefer to Transportation carried. Rereferred.
2021-04-08HouseThird Reading. Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-06HouseCarried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar.
2021-03-31HouseCarried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-30HouseCarried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-29HouseCarried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-24HouseCarried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-22HouseSecond reading.
2021-03-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-03-11HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-11HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Transportation.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2564
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2564/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2564/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2564/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2564/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2564/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2564/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31365
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32178
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=520814
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=525789

Bill Comments

feedback