OR HB2563 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Work Session held.
Pending: House Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon Health Authority to adopt rules requiring infants to be screened to detect certain diseases. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to screening newborns for diseases; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-12HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Health Care.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback