OR HB2560 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Work Session held.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires governing body of public body, to extent reasonably possible, to make all meetings accessible remotely through technological means and provide opportunity for members of general public to remotely submit oral and written testimony . Requires governing body of public body, to extent reasonably possible, to make all meetings accessible remotely through technological means and provide opportunity for members of general public to remotely submit oral and written testimony during meetings to extent in-person oral and written testimony is allowed]. Imposes same requirements on hearings under ORS chapters 197 and 215.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to expanding remote participation of public in self-government through use of technology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-27SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-15SenateReferred to Rules.
2021-04-12SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-10HouseCarried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 5--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Post, Reschke, Stark; Excused, 12--Bonham, Bynum, Clem, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Wilde, Williams, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Boshart Davis.
2021-04-10HouseThird reading.
2021-04-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-08HouseCarried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-06HouseCarried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar.
2021-03-31HouseCarried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-30HouseSecond reading.
2021-03-22HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-03-18HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Rules.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback