OR HB2558 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires local governments to allow certain residential development within one-eighth mile of fixed guideway corridor stops. Requires local governments to allow certain residential development within one-eighth mile of fixed guideway corridor stops. Establishes deadlines to incorporate requirements into land use plans.
Title
Relating to development in fixed guideway corridors.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] |
Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2558 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2558/Introduced |