OR HB2558 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Seismic Event Preparation. Directs Department of Education to conduct study regarding impacts of major seismic event on children, including identifying methods for preparing schools and communities to meet needs of children following major seismic event.] Directs task force to conduct study regarding impacts of major seismic event on children and to identify methods for preparing schools and communities to meet needs of children following major seismic event. Directs department] task force to submit report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to education no later than September 15, 2020. Sunsets task force December 31, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to seismic event preparation; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |