OR HB2555 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes severance tax on harvest of timber from forestlands in Oregon at rate of ___ per thousand feet, board measure, to fund income tax credit for milling of logs in Oregon and for distribution to counties.
Title
Relating to a severance tax on the harvest of timber; appropriating money; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |