OR HB2550 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 359, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 359, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs seller's agent to reject communication from buyer to seller as necessary to help seller avoid selecting buyer based on buyer's race, color, religion, sex, sexual orientation, national origin, marital status or familial status, in violation of federal fair housing laws. Directs seller's agent to redact or withhold] reject communication from buyer to seller as necessary to help seller avoid selecting buyer based on buyer's race, color, religion, sex, sexual orientation, national origin, marital status or familial status, in violation of federal fair housing laws.
Title
Relating to the duties of the seller's agent in real estate transactions.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Tina Kotek [D] | Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 359, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Post; Excused, 1--Nearman. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Jama. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 11--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Levy, Morgan, Smith G, Wallan. |
2021-04-14 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |