OR HB2549 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 159, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 159, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires agencies to send copies of reports on public access sites to State Marine Board and for board to make reports public, including by hosting map of reported sites on website. Requires agencies to send copies of reports on public access sites to State Marine Board and for board to make reports public, including by hosting map of reported sites on website. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to public access site reports; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Paul Holvey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 159, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 5--Anderson, Findley, Hansell, President Courtney, Thatcher. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Helm. Passed. Ayes, 46; Excused, 14--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Clem, Grayber, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Owens, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Williams, Zika. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |